Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 106 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2552 Week
» 14257 Month
» 345746 Year
» 422333 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D8212 27/11/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 15
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd.
To Service 27/11/1959
Withdrawn 30/09/1968
Time in Service 8 yrs, 10 mths , 3 dys
Cut Up 01/04/1969
Cut At Cohens (Kettering)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31B March (New) 27/11/1959
30A Stratford w/e 23/06/1962
   Withdrawn 30/09/1968

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
 
 


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
27/11/1959 To Service To service as D8212
Built at British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd.
Allocated to March (31B)
   
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
30/09/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D8212    
01/04/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    

prev prev