Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 14 Today
» 1241 Yesterday
» 6860 Week
» 18407 Month
» 418089 Year
» 494676 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D8214 09/12/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 15
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd.
To Service 09/12/1959
Withdrawn 06/12/1970
Time in Service 10 yrs, 11 mths , 27 dys
Cut Up 01/12/1971
Cut At Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31B March (New) 09/12/1959
30A Stratford w/e 23/06/1962
32B Ipswich w/e 22/06/1963
30A Stratford w/e 23/04/1966
   Withdrawn 06/12/1970


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
09/12/1959 To Service To service as D8214
Built at British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd.
Allocated to March (31B)
   
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
06/12/1970 Withdrawn Condemned as D8214    
01/12/1971 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev