Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 74 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 4931 Week
» 16636 Month
» 348125 Year
» 424712 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D8215 31/12/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 15
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd.
To Service 31/12/1959
Withdrawn 06/12/1970
Time in Service 10 yrs, 11 mths , 5 dys
Cut Up 01/11/1971
Cut At Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31B March (New) 31/12/1959
30A Stratford w/e 23/06/1962
32B Ipswich w/e 22/06/1963
30A Stratford w/e 23/04/1966
   Withdrawn 06/12/1970


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
31/12/1959 To Service To service as D8215
Built at British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd.
Allocated to March (31B)
   
02/12/1961 Sightings Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
06/12/1970 Withdrawn Condemned as D8215    
01/11/1971 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev