Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 806 Today
» 1027 Yesterday
» 2487 Week
» 24529 Month
» 130843 Year
» 641945 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D8219 29/02/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 15
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd.
To Service 29/02/1960
Withdrawn 30/09/1968
Time in Service 8 yrs, 7 mths , 1 dy
Cut Up 01/04/1969
Cut At Cohens (Kettering)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31B March (New) 29/02/1960
30A Stratford w/e 23/06/1962
32B Ipswich w/e 22/06/1963
30A Stratford w/e 23/04/1966
   Withdrawn 30/09/1968


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
29/02/1960 To Service To service as D8219
Built at British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd.
Allocated to March (31B)
   
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
30/09/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D8219    
01/04/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    

prev prev