Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 228 Today
» 1225 Yesterday
» 228 Week
» 11775 Month
» 411457 Year
» 488044 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D822 15/06/1960

Names Carried
Name Date From
HERCULES 15/06/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 42
Wheels B-B
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 15/06/1960
Withdrawn 03/10/1971
Time in Service 11 yrs, 3 mths , 18 dys
Total Mileage 1,098,000 miles
Cut Up 18/02/1972
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
83D Laira (New) 15/06/1960
83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 06/10/1962
84A Laira 4w/e 11/07/1965
83A Newton Abbot m/e 31/03/1967
84A Laira 4w/e 31/08/1967
   Withdrawn 03/10/1971

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
 


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
15/06/1960 To Service To service as D822, name: HERCULES
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Laira (83D)
   
06/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
11/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (84A)    
31/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
31/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (84A)    
03/10/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as D822    
09/01/1972 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Derelict shell RO 3/1972 Link
21/01/1972 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Around the works RO 3/1972 Link
10/02/1972 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Being cut up RO 4/1972 Link
18/02/1972 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev