Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 777 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 4394 Week
» 16099 Month
» 347588 Year
» 424175 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D8221 21/03/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 15
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd.
To Service 21/03/1960
Withdrawn 27/03/1971
Time in Service 11 yrs , 6 dys
Cut Up 01/12/1971
Cut At Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 21/03/1960
32B Ipswich w/e 26/11/1960
30A Stratford w/e 11/05/1968
   Withdrawn 27/03/1971


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
21/03/1960 To Service To service as D8221
Built at British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd.
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
26/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
27/03/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as D8221    
01/12/1971 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev