Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1211 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19014 Week
» 72030 Month
» 191557 Year
» 3218410 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8222 |
30/03/1960 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over, forward facing windows surrounds painted light green |
30/03/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 04/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/03/1960 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
15/12/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
Freight working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/03/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8222 Built at British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd. Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: Green all over, forward facing windows surrounds painted light green |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
04/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
27/03/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8222 |
|
|
12/1971 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|