Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 74 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 4931 Week
» 16636 Month
» 348125 Year
» 424712 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D8228 14/06/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 15
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd.
To Service 14/06/1960
Withdrawn 27/03/1971
Time in Service 10 yrs, 9 mths , 13 dys
Cut Up 01/12/1971
Cut At Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
32B Ipswich (New) 14/06/1960
30A Stratford w/e 26/11/1960
32B Ipswich w/e 15/09/1962
30A Stratford w/e 10/12/1966
32B Ipswich w/e 15/04/1967
30A Stratford w/e 11/05/1968
   Withdrawn 27/03/1971


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
14/06/1960 To Service To service as D8228
Built at British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd.
Allocated to Ipswich (32B)
   
26/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
10/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
15/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
27/03/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as D8228    
01/12/1971 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev