Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 801 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5402 Week
» 16949 Month
» 416631 Year
» 493218 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D823 06/07/1960

Names Carried
Name Date From
HERMES 06/07/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 42
Wheels B-B
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 06/07/1960
Withdrawn 03/10/1971
Time in Service 11 yrs, 2 mths , 27 dys
Total Mileage 1,058,000 miles
Cut Up 19/05/1972
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
83D Laira (New) 06/07/1960
83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 06/10/1962
84A Laira 4w/e 11/07/1965
83A Newton Abbot m/e 31/03/1967
84A Laira 4w/e 31/08/1967
   Withdrawn 03/10/1971


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
06/07/1960 To Service To service as D823, name: HERMES
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Laira (83D)
   
06/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
11/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (84A)    
31/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
31/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (84A)    
22/07/1969 Sightings Newton Abbot Depot visit: On Newton Abbot depot RO 10/1969 Link
03/10/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as D823    
09/01/1972 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Derelict shell RO 3/1972 Link
21/01/1972 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Around the works RO 3/1972 Link
19/05/1972 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev