Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 498 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5099 Week
» 16646 Month
» 416328 Year
» 492915 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D8231 18/07/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 15
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd.
To Service 18/07/1960
Withdrawn 27/03/1971
Time in Service 10 yrs, 8 mths , 9 dys
Cut Up 01/01/1972
Cut At Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
32A Norwich Thorpe (New) 18/07/1960
31B March w/e 17/09/1960
30A Stratford w/e 26/11/1960
34G Finsbury Park w/e 27/04/1963
30A Stratford w/e 12/12/1970
   Withdrawn 27/03/1971


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
18/07/1960 To Service To service as D8231
Built at British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd.
Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)
   
17/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
26/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
27/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
21/06/1969 Sightings Hornsey depot: On shed RO 9/1969 Link
29/06/1969 Sightings Finsbury Park depot: On shed RO 9/1969 Link
12/12/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
27/03/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as D8231    
01/01/1972 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev