Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1986 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15392 Week
» 68408 Month
» 187935 Year
» 3214788 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8232 |
23/08/1960 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over, forward facing windows surrounds painted light green |
23/08/1960 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/08/1960 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/08/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8232 Built at British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd. Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) Livery applied: Green all over, forward facing windows surrounds painted light green |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
27/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
13/10/1968 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
12/12/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
27/03/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8232 |
|
|
11/1971 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|