Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3771 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17177 Week
» 70193 Month
» 189720 Year
» 3216573 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8233 |
31/08/1960 |
|
Departmental (Dept) |
ADB968001 |
17/02/1969 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
15 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd. |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star |
|
To Service |
31/08/1960 to Stratford (30A) |
Withdrawn |
16/02/1969 |
Time in Service |
8 yrs, 5 mths , 16 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over, forward facing windows surrounds painted light green |
31/08/1960 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/08/1960 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
01/01/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/08/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8233 Built at British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd. Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: Green all over, forward facing windows surrounds painted light green |
|
|
27/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
16/02/1969 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8233 |
|
|
17/02/1969 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to ADB968001 |
|
|