Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 76 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 4933 Week
» 16638 Month
» 348127 Year
» 424714 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D8235 30/09/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 15
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd.
To Service 30/09/1960
Withdrawn 06/10/1968
Time in Service 8 yrs , 6 dys
Cut Up 01/04/1969
Cut At Cohens (Kettering)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
32B Ipswich (New) 30/09/1960
30A Stratford w/e 26/11/1960
34G Finsbury Park w/e 27/04/1963
30A Stratford w/e 07/10/1967
   Withdrawn 06/10/1968


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
30/09/1960 To Service To service as D8235
Built at British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd.
Allocated to Ipswich (32B)
   
26/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
27/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
07/10/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
06/10/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D8235    
01/04/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    
15/06/1969 Sightings G. Cohen's scrapyard, Kettering: In scrapyard RO 9/1969 Link

prev prev