Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 18 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 6233 Week
» 17938 Month
» 349427 Year
» 426014 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D8237 17/11/1960
Departmental (Dept) ADB968002 21/03/1969

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 15
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd.
To Service 17/11/1960
Withdrawn 20/03/1969
Time in Service 8 yrs, 4 mths , 3 dys
Cut Up 01/04/1985
Cut At Marples and Gillot (Sheffield)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34G Finsbury Park (New) 17/11/1960
30A Stratford w/e 27/04/1963
32B Ipswich w/e 15/04/1967
30A Stratford w/e 11/05/1968
   Withdrawn 20/03/1969


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
17/11/1960 To Service To service as D8237
Built at British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd.
Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G)
   
27/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
15/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
20/03/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as D8237    
21/03/1969 Renumbered Renumbered to ADB968002    
01/04/1985 Scrapped Broken up by Marples and Gillot: Sheffield    

prev prev