Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3560 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13134 Week
» 78088 Month
» 280752 Year
» 3307605 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8237 |
17/11/1960 |
|
Departmental (Dept) |
ADB968002 |
21/03/1969 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over, forward facing windows surrounds painted light green |
17/11/1960 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/11/1960 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/11/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8237 Built at British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd. Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G) Livery applied: Green all over, forward facing windows surrounds painted light green |
|
|
27/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
15/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
20/03/1969 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8237 |
|
|
21/03/1969 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to ADB968002 |
|
|
04/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Marples and Gillot: Sheffield |
|
|