Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 494 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5095 Week
» 16642 Month
» 416324 Year
» 492911 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D8238 21/12/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 15
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd.
To Service 21/12/1960
Withdrawn 30/09/1968
Time in Service 7 yrs, 9 mths , 9 dys
Cut Up 01/04/1969
Cut At Cohens (Kettering)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34G Finsbury Park (New) 21/12/1960
30A Stratford w/e 27/04/1963
   Withdrawn 30/09/1968


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
21/12/1960 To Service To service as D8238
Built at British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd.
Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G)
   
27/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
30/09/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D8238    
01/04/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    
15/06/1969 Sightings G. Cohen's scrapyard, Kettering: In scrapyard RO 9/1969 Link

prev prev