Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 360 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6144 Week
» 27533 Month
» 147060 Year
» 3173913 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8242 |
10/02/1961 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over, forward facing windows surrounds painted light green |
10/02/1961 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 05/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/02/1961 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
13/01/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/02/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8242 Built at British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd. Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G) Livery applied: Green all over, forward facing windows surrounds painted light green |
|
|
27/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
26/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
05/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
27/03/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8242 |
|
|
11/1971 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|