Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 2431 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15837 Week
» 68853 Month
» 188380 Year
» 3215233 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8243 |
24/02/1961 |
|
Departmental (Dept) |
ADB968000 |
17/02/1969 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over, forward facing windows surrounds painted light green |
24/02/1961 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
01/1968 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/02/1961 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/02/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8243 Built at British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd. Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G) Livery applied: Green all over, forward facing windows surrounds painted light green |
|
|
27/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
06/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
07/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
16/02/1969 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8243 |
|
|
17/02/1969 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to ADB968000 |
|
|
02/1991 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|