Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 536 Today
» 1293 Yesterday
» 6743 Week
» 4256 Month
» 232140 Year
» 1453705 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D825 24/08/1960  

Names Carried
Name Date From
INTREPID 24/08/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 42
Wheels B-B
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 437
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Steam Boiler Stone OK4616
AWS Western Region AWS fitted
Multiple Fitting White Diamond
To Service 24/08/1960
Withdrawn 23/08/1972
Time in Service 11 yrs, 11 mths , 30 dys
Total Mileage 1,014,000 miles
Cut Up 27/10/1972
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
83D Laira (New) 24/08/1960
83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 28/01/1961
84A Laira 4w/e 11/07/1965
83A Newton Abbot m/e 31/03/1967
84A Laira 4w/e 31/08/1967
83A Newton Abbot 9w/e 16/10/1971
   Withdrawn 01/01/1972
84A Laira (Reinstated) w/e 06/05/1972
   Withdrawn 23/08/1972

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84A Laira 4w/e 11/07/1965
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 10w/e 14/05/1967
ALLOC 84A Laira 10w/e 04/12/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
25/06/1964 Not severe   Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows Oil impregnated dirt or waste    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
24/08/1960 To Service To service as D825, name: INTREPID
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Laira (83D)
   
28/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
12/11/1961 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
11/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (84A)    
23/10/1966 Sightings Salisbury depot: On shed RO 12/1966 Link
31/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
31/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (84A)    
16/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
01/01/1972 Withdrawn Condemned as D825    
06/05/1972 Reinstated Reinstated to Laira (84A)    
23/08/1972 Withdrawn Condemned as D825    
27/10/1972 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev