Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 567 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6351 Week
» 27740 Month
» 147267 Year
» 3174120 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D828 |
19/10/1960 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
42 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
B-B |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
437 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4616 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted | Multiple Fitting | White Diamond |
|
To Service |
19/10/1960 to Laira (83D) |
Withdrawn |
28/05/1971 |
Time in Service |
10 yrs, 7 mths , 9 dys |
Total Mileage |
922,000 miles |
Cut Up |
07/04/1972 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/10/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/10/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D828, name: MAGNIFICENT Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
28/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
11/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
19/09/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
31/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
07/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
28/05/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 828 |
|
|
14/08/1971 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
07/04/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|