Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 499 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5100 Week
» 16647 Month
» 416329 Year
» 492916 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D829 23/11/1960

Names Carried
Name Date From
MAGPIE 23/11/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 42
Wheels B-B
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 23/11/1960
Withdrawn 26/08/1972
Time in Service 11 yrs, 9 mths , 3 dys
Total Mileage 975,000 miles
Cut Up 30/01/1974
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
83D Laira (New) 23/11/1960
83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 28/01/1961
84A Laira 4w/e 11/07/1965
83A Newton Abbot 6w/e 19/09/1965
84A Laira 4w/e 31/08/1967
83A Newton Abbot 9w/e 16/10/1971
   Withdrawn 01/01/1972
84A Laira (Reinstated) w/e 06/05/1972
   Withdrawn 26/08/1972


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
23/11/1960 To Service To service as D829, name: MAGPIE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Laira (83D)
   
28/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
11/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (84A)    
19/09/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
23/10/1966 Sightings Salisbury depot: On shed RO 12/1966 Link
31/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (84A)    
22/07/1969 Sightings Laira Depot visit: On Laira depot. RO 10/1969 Link
16/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
01/01/1972 Withdrawn Condemned as D829    
06/05/1972 Reinstated Reinstated to Laira (84A)    
26/08/1972 Withdrawn Condemned as D829    
30/01/1974 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev