Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 4026 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17432 Week
» 70448 Month
» 189975 Year
» 3216828 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8301 |
22/04/1967 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20201 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
22/04/1967 to York (North) (50A) |
Withdrawn |
02/09/1988 |
Time in Service |
21 yrs, 4 mths , 11 dys |
Cut Up |
05/1990 |
Cut At |
Vic Berry (Leicester) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
22/04/1967 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1974 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1976 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1976 |
|
Slow Speed Control fitted
|
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/04/1967 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
11/1976 |
xos |
Dual brakes, No heat, Slow Speed Control |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/04/1967 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8301 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to York (North) (50A) Livery applied: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20201 |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
04/07/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
11/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Slow Speed Control fitted
|
|
|
09/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
02/09/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20201 |
|
|
05/1990 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|