Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1077 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18880 Week
» 71896 Month
» 191423 Year
» 3218276 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8309 |
20/05/1967 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20209 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (20/9) |
20907 |
|
Spares only |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
20/05/1967 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
01/1971 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
27/02/1971 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1974 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/05/1967 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
01/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
27/02/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/05/1967 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8309 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to York (North) (50A) Livery applied: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
01/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
27/02/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20209 |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
1989 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 20907 but not taken up |
|
|
24/02/1989 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20209 |
|
|
12/2001 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Michael Douglas Ltd: Carlisle |
|
|