Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 493 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18296 Week
» 71312 Month
» 190839 Year
» 3217692 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8319 |
27/01/1968 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20219 |
09/1974 |
|
TOPS (20/9) |
20906 |
22/08/1989 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
Class | From | 20 | 27/01/1968 | 20/9 | 22/08/1989 |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
27/01/1968 to Haymarket (64B) |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
27/01/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 11/1973 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/01/1968 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 11/1973 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/01/1968 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8319 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Haymarket (64B) Livery applied: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
01/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
27/01/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
11/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20219 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
22/08/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20906 |
|
|