Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 777 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 4394 Week
» 16099 Month
» 347588 Year
» 424175 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D832 08/02/1961

Names Carried
Name Date From
ONSLAUGHT 08/02/1961

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 42
Wheels B-B
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 08/02/1961
Withdrawn 16/12/1972
Time in Service 11 yrs, 10 mths , 8 dys
Total Mileage 1,131,000 miles
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
83D Laira (New) 08/02/1961
83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 12/08/1961
84A Laira 4w/e 11/07/1965
83A Newton Abbot 6w/e 19/09/1965
84A Laira 4w/e 31/08/1967
83A Newton Abbot 9w/e 16/10/1971
84A Laira 9w/e 08/01/1972
   Stored w/e 11/11/1972
   Withdrawn 16/12/1972

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
08/02/1961 To Service To service as D832, name: ONSLAUGHT
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Laira (83D)
   
02/07/1961 Sightings Stabled at Old Oak Common: Stabled in Old Oak Common shed   Link
12/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
12/11/1961 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
11/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (84A)    
19/09/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
31/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (84A)    
16/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
08/01/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (84A)    
11/11/1972 To Store To Store    
16/12/1972 Withdrawn Condemned as D832    

prev prev