Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 290 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18093 Week
» 71109 Month
» 190636 Year
» 3217489 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8322 |
30/12/1967 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20222 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
30/12/1967 to Polmadie (66A) |
Withdrawn |
15/12/1987 |
Time in Service |
19 yrs, 11 mths , 15 dys |
Cut Up |
29/10/1988 |
Cut At |
MC Metals (Springburn) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
30/12/1967 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 11/1973 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/12/1967 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 11/1973 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Sightings
Report Date |
Title |
Location |
Report |
Headcode |
Reference |
01/03/1975 |
Eastfield shed visit |
Eastfield |
On shed |
|
Bruce Strong, Facebook |
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/12/1967 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8322 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Polmadie (66A) Livery applied: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
24/02/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
01/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
01/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
11/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20222 |
|
|
15/12/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20222 |
|
|
29/10/1988 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|