Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 64 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1098 Week
» 23604 Month
» 326794 Year
» 1548359 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 84015 on 02/10/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 2 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 02/10/1953 to Low Moor (25F)
Withdrawal Sat 11/12/1965
Scrapping During 02/1966 at Central Wagon Co. (Wigan)
Service Life 12 yrs, 2 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
25F Low Moor (New) on 02/10/1953
26F Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 25/09/1954
24B Rose Grove 4w/e 21/05/1955
24F Fleetwood 4w/e 08/10/1955
24J Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 10/08/1957
24G Skipton 4w/e 09/08/1958
70D Eastleigh w/e 13/11/1965
91M To London Midland Region 2w/e 06/12/1965
70D Eastleigh 2w/e 06/12/1965
   Withdrawn on 11/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 25F Low Moor w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 26F Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 02/10/1954
ALLOC 24B Rose Grove 4w/e 18/06/1955
ALLOC 24F Fleetwood 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 24J Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 24G Skipton 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh w/e 07/11/1965
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 4w/e 04/12/1965
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region w/e 05/12/1965
WDN   w/e 11/12/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
08/01/1961 Crewe Works (Works Sidings) Paint Shop: D77/8, D83/5, D3921, 42179, 45063/8, 45646/95, 48755, L.N.W.R. 1054 and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D74/5/9, D80/2/4, 44767, 45132, 45201, 45348, 45667, 46457, 48529, 48600, 70032, 90346. Works Sidings: 40161, 44697, 44734/82, 44867, 44936, 45336, 45428, 46235, 46430, 49158/99, 49270, 49432, 70021, 84015, 92092, 92160/7. Erecting Shop: D90-6, 42476, 42580, 44869, 45037/48, 45197, 45219/40/50/77/94, 45302/44, 45411/9, 45506/78/82, 45616/38/54/75/80, 46203/9/47/50/5, 46410/36, 48054, 48120/73, 48255, 48438, 48635/68, 48898, 49281, 70033, 90137/8/57/97, 90203/33/51, 90316, 90509, 92018/33/43, 92134/55/65. Outside Erecting Shop: 42295, 45515/60, 46103/36/7, 48508, 49034, 90297, 92048. New Erecting Shop: D76, D81/6-9, D97-102. Cutting-up Shop: Nil. SLS/196102
20/09/1964 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D1622 painted, D1623 undercoat, D1626 undercoat, D1627 undercoat, D6786, 26049. Arrival Sidings: 42233, 42267, 42651, 42665, 44667, 45031, 45038, 45249, 48050, 48056, 48153, 48205, 48206, 48252, 48267, 48301, 48365, 48558, 48617, 78023, 92157. Works Siding adjacent to Scrap Road: 48069, 48155, 48202, 48310, 48657. Scrap Road: 42092, 48341, 84023. Traction Shop: D338, D371, E3012, 26025, 27004, 27005. Traction Shop Yard: D203, D274, D304, D379, D1646, D1647, D1648, D1649, D1650, D1651 shell, D8055. Erecting Shop Yard: D221, D232, D348, 42115, 48450, 70031. Minor Repair Road: 44688, 45195, 45455. Erecting Shop: D237, D244, D290, D301, D306, D329, D370, D380, D1624 undercoat, D1628 undercoat, D1629 undercoat, D1630 motors mounted, D1631 motors mounted, D1632 motors mounted, D1633, D1634, D1635, D1636, D1637, D1638, D1639, D1640, D1641, D1642, D1643, D1644, D1645 shell, D5706, D6768, D8017, D8056, 42436, 42546, 44664, 44779, 44814, 44835, 45005, 45327, 46487, 48057, 48218, 48247, 48335, 48351, 48356, 48357, 48364, 48435, 48540, 70022, 84015, 84025. Works Yard: 42186, 42421, 42608, 44663, 44715, 44803, 44857, 45103, 45307, 45392, 45716, 46491, 48002, 48024, 48081, 48160, 48334, 48552, 48721, 70033, 70034, 70053, 92024, 92100, 92139, 92206, 92223, 92231. Paint Shop Yard: D213, D276, D283, D354, D1621 painted, D333, D1625 undercoat, D6788, D8045, D8052, 42072, 45112, 45325, 48253, 48548, 48676, 70001, 70009, 70044, 78044. SLS/196410
10/10/1964 Crewe Works (Outside paint shop) Erecting shop: D1631-6 Motors, D1636-43 Equip., D1644-53 bodies; D243/71/87/97, D345/77/90/9, D5706/16, D6737, D8038/44/7, 42187, 42546, 44715, 44803/57, 44934, 45038, 45307/92, 48081, 48155/205/310/34/552/617, 70033/53, 78023, 84028, 92024/98, 92100; New Erecting shop: D324/36/8/53, 26025/57, 27005. Traverser Area: D237 on test, D1630 on test, D301/5/80/2, D5714, D6787/911, E3014, 26030, 44838, 45005/191, 45455, 48002/24/46/160/435/639/719/21, 70002/22, 92233; Paint shop: D221, D1627/8, D8017; Outside paint shop: D290, D304/48, D1629, 44688/779/846, 46847, 48356, 84015/25; Works yard: D232, 44710/74/985, 45279, 46484, 46519, 48306/57/533/654/740, 70011/34, 80072, 92008/74/9. SLS/196411

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/10/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 84015
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Low Moor (25F)
   
25/09/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26F)    
21/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Fleetwood (24F)    
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J)    
09/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Skipton (24G)    
13/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
06/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
06/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
11/12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 84015    

prev prev