Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2871 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16277 Week
» 69293 Month
» 188820 Year
» 3215673 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
84018 |
on |
23/10/1953 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
26D |
|
Bury (New) |
on |
23/10/1953 |
24F |
|
Fleetwood |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
24/04/1965 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
26D |
Bury |
w/e |
24/10/1953 |
ALLOC |
24F |
Fleetwood |
4w/e |
15/05/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
24/04/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/10/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 84018 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Bury (26D) |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fleetwood (24F) |
|
|
24/04/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 84018 |
|
|
11/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Hughes Bolckows: North Blyth |
|
|