Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2536 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15942 Week
» 68958 Month
» 188485 Year
» 3215338 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
84019 |
on |
31/10/1953 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/10/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 84019 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Bury (26D) |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fleetwood (24F) |
|
|
03/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26E) |
|
|
19/04/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
13/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
06/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
06/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
11/12/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 84019 |
|
|
03/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Parkgate |
|
|