Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 820 Today
» 1106 Yesterday
» 7972 Week
» 27617 Month
» 62259 Year
» 1283824 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 84022   30/03/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 2 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Sat 30/03/1957 to Ashford (74A)
Withdrawal Sat 05/09/1964
Scrapping During 10/1964 at Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
Service Life 7 yrs, 5 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
74A Ashford (New) 30/03/1957
73B Bricklayers Arms m/e 10/02/1961
72A Exmouth Junction 3w/e 26/05/1961
6G Llandudno Junction w/e 16/09/1961
   To Crewe Works w/e 14/07/1962
   Withdrawn 05/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 74A Ashford 30/03/1957
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 10/02/1961
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 30/09/1961
ALLOC CreweWorks   5w/e 04/08/1962
WDN   w/e 05/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/03/1957 To Service To service as BR Number 84022
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (74A)
   
10/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Works (99C)    
05/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 84022    
10/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev