Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 933 Today
» 1090 Yesterday
» 3248 Week
» 31206 Month
» 65848 Year
» 1287413 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 84023   05/04/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 2 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Sat 05/04/1957 to Ashford (74A)
Withdrawal Sat 05/09/1964
Scrapping During 10/1964 at Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
Service Life 7 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
74A Ashford (New) 05/04/1957
73B Bricklayers Arms m/e 10/02/1961
72A Exmouth Junction 3w/e 26/05/1961
24J Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 16/09/1961
8D Widnes w/e 06/01/1962
   To Crewe Works w/e 14/07/1962
   Withdrawn 05/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 74A Ashford 05/04/1957
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 10/02/1961
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 24J Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 30/09/1961
ALLOC 8D Widnes 4w/e 27/01/1962
ALLOC CreweWorks   5w/e 04/08/1962
WDN   w/e 05/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/04/1957 To Service To service as BR Number 84023
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (74A)
   
10/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J)    
06/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Widnes (8D)    
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Works (99C)    
05/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 84023    
10/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev