Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 4110 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 18153 Week
» 83107 Month
» 285771 Year
» 3312624 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8403 |
18/07/1958 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over, forward facing windows surrounds painted light green |
18/07/1958 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
01/1968 |
|
Allocations - WIP
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
30A |
|
Stratford (New) |
on |
18/07/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
07/07/1968 |
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/07/1958 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
17/05/1962 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
21/09/1962 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
10/11/1958 |
22/11/1958 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
13 days |
|
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
18/06/1959 |
25/06/1959 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
8 days |
|
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
29/08/1960 |
24/09/1960 |
Light Intermediate |
|
|
|
27 days |
|
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
27/01/1961 |
18/02/1961 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
23 days |
|
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
01/03/1961 |
25/03/1961 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
25 days |
|
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
11/04/1961 |
06/05/1961 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
26 days |
|
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
08/05/1961 |
15/05/1961 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
8 days |
|
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
30/05/1961 |
03/06/1961 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
5 days |
|
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
13/03/1962 |
05/04/1962 |
Light Intermediate |
|
|
|
24 days |
|
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
25/10/1962 |
29/03/1963 |
General |
|
|
|
156 days |
|
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
30/04/1963 |
22/07/1963 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
84 days |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/07/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8403 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27674 Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: Green all over, forward facing windows surrounds painted light green |
|
|
10/11/1958 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/11/1958. Dep: 22/11/1958. |
|
|
18/06/1959 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/06/1959. Dep: 25/06/1959. |
|
|
29/08/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 29/08/1960. Dep: 24/09/1960. |
|
|
27/01/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/01/1961. Dep: 18/02/1961. |
|
|
01/03/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/03/1961. Dep: 25/03/1961. |
|
|
11/04/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/04/1961. Dep: 06/05/1961. |
|
|
08/05/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/05/1961. Dep: 15/05/1961. |
|
|
30/05/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/05/1961. Dep: 03/06/1961. |
|
|
13/03/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 13/03/1962. Dep: 05/04/1962. |
|
|
25/10/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1962. Dep: 29/03/1963. |
|
|
30/04/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/04/1963. Dep: 22/07/1963. |
|
|
01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
07/07/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8403 |
|
|
04/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|