16/09/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8406 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27677 Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: Green all over, forward facing windows surrounds painted light green |
|
|
19/11/1958 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/11/1958. Dep: 24/11/1958. |
|
|
25/06/1959 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/06/1959. Dep: 03/07/1959. |
|
|
19/08/1959 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/08/1959. Dep: 21/08/1959. |
|
|
04/12/1959 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/12/1959. Dep: 30/01/1960. |
|
|
15/02/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/02/1960. Dep: 25/02/1960. |
|
|
10/03/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/03/1960. Dep: 14/04/1960. |
|
|
25/04/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/04/1960. Dep: 27/04/1960. |
|
|
19/09/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/09/1960. Dep: 06/10/1960. |
|
|
07/02/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/02/1961. Dep: 18/02/1961. |
|
|
01/03/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/03/1961. Dep: 30/03/1961. |
|
|
10/04/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/04/1961. Dep: 19/04/1961. |
|
|
19/06/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/06/1961. Dep: 22/06/1961. |
|
|
26/06/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/06/1961. Dep: 29/06/1961. |
|
|
17/07/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/07/1961. Dep: 21/07/1961. |
|
|
01/08/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 01/08/1961. Dep: 01/09/1961. |
|
|
06/09/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/09/1961. Dep: 07/09/1961. |
|
|
20/09/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/09/1961. Dep: 26/09/1961. |
|
|
16/10/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/10/1961. Dep: 24/10/1961. |
|
|
04/01/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/01/1962. Dep: 20/01/1962. |
|
|
24/09/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1962. Dep: 19/02/1963. |
|
|
19/07/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/07/1963. Dep: 23/07/1963. |
|
|
01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
30/09/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8406 |
|
|
07/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Birds: Long Marston |
|
|