Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 429 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 429 Week
» 22935 Month
» 326125 Year
» 1547690 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 8413 on 31/01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class 94xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder W.G. Bagnall
Order Number Unk
Works Number 2923
To Service Thu 31/01/1950
Withdrawal Thu 12/01/1961
Scrapping During 02/1961
Service Life 10 yrs, 11 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 31/01/1950
81C Southall 4w/e 26/01/1957
   Withdrawn on 12/01/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 31/03/1947
NEW SPM St Philips Marsh m/e 31/01/1950
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 26/01/1957
WDN   m/e 31/01/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/01/1950 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 8413
Built at W.G. Bagnall, Works Number 2923
   
26/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
12/01/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 8413    

prev prev