Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 230 Today
» 1267 Yesterday
» 230 Week
» 34805 Month
» 104284 Year
» 1325849 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 8419   30/04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class 94xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder W.G. Bagnall
To Service Thu 30/04/1950
Withdrawal During 01/1960
Scrapping During 03/1965
Service Life 9 yrs, 8 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88F Treherbert 4w/e 08/10/1955
88A Radyr 4w/e 12/06/1958
88C Barry 4w/e 21/02/1959
   Withdrawn m/e 01/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 31/03/1947
NEW NYA   05/04/1950
ALLOC 84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 88A Radyr 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 21/02/1959
WDN   m/e 31/01/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/04/1950 To Service To service as GWR Number 8419    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
12/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88A)    
21/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
01/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 8419    

prev prev