Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2269 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20072 Week
» 73088 Month
» 192615 Year
» 3219468 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
8420 |
on |
31/07/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Hawksworth |
Class |
94xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
W.G. Bagnall |
Order Number |
Unk |
Works Number |
2930 |
To Service |
Thu 31/07/1950 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 03/06/1965 |
Service Life |
14 yrs, 10 mths , 3 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/07/1950 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 8420 Built at W.G. Bagnall, Works Number 2930 |
|
|
12/08/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
31/08/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) |
|
|
11/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abercynon (88E) |
|
|
31/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abercynon (88E) |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Treherbert (88F) |
|
|
12/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88A) |
|
|
16/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
25/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) |
|
|
24/08/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
03/06/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8420 |
|
|
10/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|