Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 415 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1800 Week
» 8605 Month
» 115551 Year
» 1337116 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 8437   31/05/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class 94xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder W.G. Bagnall
To Service Sat 31/05/1953 to Stourbridge Junction (84F)
Withdrawal During 11/1964
Scrapping During 02/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 11 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
84F Stourbridge Junction (New) 31/05/1953
88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 10/09/1955
88C Barry 4w/e 05/10/1957
86H Aberbeeg 4w/e 21/02/1959
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
EXLOAN 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/04/1947
ALLOC 84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 16/05/1953
NEW NYA   m/e 31/05/1953
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 10/09/1955
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 86H Aberbeeg 4w/e 21/02/1959
WDN   w/e 02/11/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/05/1953 To Service To service as GWR Number 8437
Allocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F)
   
10/09/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
05/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
21/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Aberbeeg (86H)    
11/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 8437    
02/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev