Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1377 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19180 Week
» 72196 Month
» 191723 Year
» 3218576 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D844 |
16/03/1961 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
SPARTAN |
16/03/1961 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
43 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
B-B |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Number |
L100 |
Works Number |
27973 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4616 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted | Multiple Fitting | White Diamond |
|
To Service |
16/03/1961 to Laira (83D) |
Withdrawn |
03/10/1971 |
Time in Service |
10 yrs, 6 mths , 17 dys |
Total Mileage |
726,000 miles |
Cut Up |
26/05/1972 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
MFYE |
Maroon bodywork, full yellow cab front |
02/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/03/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/03/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D844, name: SPARTAN Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27973 Allocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
24/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
31/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Maroon bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
15/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/10/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 844 |
|
|
26/05/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|