Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 118 Today
» 1134 Yesterday
» 3486 Week
» 24388 Month
» 24388 Year
» 1245953 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 8441 m/e 04/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class 94xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder W.G. Bagnall
To Service During 04/1954 to Cardiff East Dock (88B)
Withdrawal Sat 30/12/1961
Scrapping During 04/1962 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 7 yrs, 8 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88B Cardiff East Dock (New) m/e 04/1954
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 25/01/1958
   Withdrawn 30/12/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
EXLOAN 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/04/1947
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 24/04/1954
NEW NYA   m/e 30/04/1954
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 28/12/1957
WDN   m/e 31/12/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1954 To Service To service as GWR Number 8441
Allocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)
   
25/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
30/12/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 8441    
04/03/1962 Sightings Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - Triangle.   Link
04/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev