Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1163 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14569 Week
» 67585 Month
» 187112 Year
» 3213965 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
8443 |
on |
25/03/1954 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Hawksworth |
Class |
94xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
W.G. Bagnall |
Order Number |
Unk |
Works Number |
2953 |
To Service |
Mon 25/03/1954 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 22/06/1959 |
Service Life |
5 yrs, 2 mths , 28 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
25/03/1954 |
87D |
|
Swansea East Dock |
4w/e |
24/04/1954 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
22/06/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
87D |
Swansea East Dock |
4w/e |
24/04/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/06/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/03/1954 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 8443 Built at W.G. Bagnall, Works Number 2953 |
|
|
24/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) |
|
|
22/06/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8443 |
|
|
12/1960 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|