Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 466 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1851 Week
» 8656 Month
» 115602 Year
» 1337167 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 8450   31/08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class 94xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
To Service Sun 31/08/1949 to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT )
Withdrawal During 06/1959
Scrapping During 12/1960 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 9 yrs , 9 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NPT Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) 31/08/1949
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 30/09/1950
88C Barry m/e 16/06/1956
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
EXLOAN 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/04/1947
NEW NPTG Ebbw Junction (Newport) 17/08/1949
1STALLOC NPTG Ebbw Junction (Newport) m/e 30/09/1949
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 09/09/1950
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 16/06/1956
WDN   m/e 30/06/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/08/1949 To Service To service as GWR Number 8450
Built at Yorkshire Engine Company
Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)
   
30/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
06/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 8450    
12/1960 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev