Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 419 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1804 Week
» 8609 Month
» 115555 Year
» 1337120 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 8451   30/09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class 94xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
To Service Tue 30/09/1949
Withdrawal During 11/1961
Scrapping During 04/1962
Service Life 12 yrs, 1 mth , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BRY Barry 4w/e 05/11/1949
83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 03/10/1953
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 01/11/1958
81C Southall 4w/e 16/05/1959
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 30/09/1949
1STALLOC NYA   m/e 31/10/1949
1STALLOC BRY Barry m/e 30/11/1949
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 16/05/1959
WDN   m/e 30/11/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/09/1949 To Service To service as GWR Number 8451
Built at Yorkshire Engine Company
   
05/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (BRY)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
01/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
16/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
11/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 8451    
04/03/1962 Sightings Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - Dump.   Link

prev prev