Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 318 Today
» 1267 Yesterday
» 318 Week
» 34893 Month
» 104372 Year
» 1325937 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 8455   31/01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class 94xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
To Service Thu 31/01/1950
Withdrawal During 01/1960
Scrapping During 12/1960 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 9 yrs , 11 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 27/12/1952
88C Barry 4w/e 25/11/1953
88F Treherbert 4w/e 16/07/1955
88A Radyr 4w/e 06/09/1958
   Withdrawn m/e 01/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
EXLOAN 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/04/1947
NEW CED Cardiff East Dock m/e 31/01/1950
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 27/12/1952
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 28/11/1953
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 88A Radyr 4w/e 06/09/1958
WDN   m/e 31/01/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/01/1950 To Service To service as GWR Number 8455
Built at Yorkshire Engine Company
   
27/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
25/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
06/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88A)    
01/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 8455    
12/1960 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev