Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 429 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1814 Week
» 8619 Month
» 115565 Year
» 1337130 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 8470   31/05/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class 94xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
To Service Sun 31/05/1951 to Barry (88C)
Withdrawal During 01/1962
Scrapping During 05/1962
Service Life 10 yrs , 7 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88C Barry (New) 31/05/1951
88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 01/11/1952
   Withdrawn m/e 01/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 19/05/1951
NEW NYA   m/e 31/05/1951
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 01/11/1952
WDN   m/e 31/01/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/05/1951 To Service To service as GWR Number 8470
Built at Yorkshire Engine Company
Allocated to Barry (88C)
   
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
01/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 8470    

prev prev