Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 403 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1788 Week
» 8593 Month
» 115539 Year
» 1337104 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 8478   31/05/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class 94xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
To Service Sat 31/05/1952 to Barry (88C)
Withdrawal 4w/e Sat 09/02/1963
Scrapping During 02/1963
Service Life 10 yrs, 8 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88C Barry (New) 31/05/1952
88B Cardiff East Dock 2w/e 12/07/1952
88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 01/11/1952
   Withdrawn 4w/e 09/02/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 31/05/1952
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 01/11/1952
WDN   4w/e 09/02/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/05/1952 To Service To service as GWR Number 8478
Built at Yorkshire Engine Company
Allocated to Barry (88C)
   
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
09/02/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 8478    

prev prev