Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2715 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16121 Week
» 69137 Month
» 188664 Year
» 3215517 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
8482 |
on |
15/04/1952 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1964 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
NYA |
|
m/e |
30/04/1952 |
ALLOC |
88A |
Cardiff Cathays |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
ALLOC |
82D |
Westbury |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
ALLOC |
87B |
Duffryn Yard |
4w/e |
28/01/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/04/1952 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 8482 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 1829 Allocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) |
|
|
25/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westbury (82D) |
|
|
28/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) |
|
|
12/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8482 |
|
|
07/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|