Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3296 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16702 Week
» 69718 Month
» 189245 Year
» 3216098 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
8497 |
on |
07/11/1952 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1968 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
NYA |
|
m/e |
30/11/1952 |
ALLOC |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
ALLOC |
86F |
Tondu |
4w/e |
24/01/1953 |
ALLOC |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
4w/e |
18/06/1960 |
ALLOC |
88B |
Radyr |
4w/e |
09/02/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
08/07/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
09/12/1962 |
Cardiff East Dock MPD |
There is no diesel locomotive whatever here and CED is now a full main line shed for the first time in its life ! This must be unique in railway history and the steam phase is expected to last two years as Canton is being demolished completely to make way for a diesel shed and main diesel depot for S. Wales. On 9th December, 1962, the following were on shed-1613, 2875/97, 3662, 3782/4, 3804/10, 4090, 4242/72/82, 5043/74/81/97, 5220/4/5/9, 5749, 6606/37/81, 6813/32/75/6, 6918/32/45/56/72/7/87/95, 7016, 7913, 8425/97, 9426/37, 9629, 92003/236/44/6. |
SLS/196302 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/11/1952 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 8497 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 1844 Allocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
27/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
24/01/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tondu (86F) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) |
|
|
09/02/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88B) |
|
|
06/07/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8497 |
|
|
06/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|