Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 755 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5329 Week
» 33287 Month
» 67929 Year
» 1289494 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 8498   30/11/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class 94xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
To Service Mon 30/11/1952 to Swindon (82C)
Withdrawal During 06/1965
Scrapping During 10/1965
Service Life 12 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
82C Swindon (New) 30/11/1952
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 27/12/1952
86F Tondu 4w/e 24/01/1953
84C Banbury 4w/e 28/11/1959
84A Stafford Road 4w/e 21/05/1960
81A Old Oak Common w/e 20/07/1963
81C Southall 3w/e 28/03/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 29/11/1952
NEW NYA   m/e 30/11/1952
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 27/12/1952
ALLOC 86F Tondu 4w/e 24/01/1953
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 84A Stafford Road 4w/e 21/05/1960
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 27/07/1963
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 03/08/1963
ALLOC 81C Southall 5w/e 12/04/1965
TOSTORE   5w/e 16/05/1965
WDN   03/06/1965
WDN   4w/e 13/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/11/1952 To Service To service as GWR Number 8498
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Allocated to Swindon (82C)
   
27/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
24/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Tondu (86F)    
28/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
21/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A)    
20/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
28/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 8498    

prev prev