Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3048 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16454 Week
» 69470 Month
» 188997 Year
» 3215850 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8523 |
09/07/1963 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/07/1963 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/07/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8523 Built at Clayton Equipment Co. Ltd., Hatton, Derby Allocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
13/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8523 |
|
|
06/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow |
|
|