Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 127 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 5936 Week
» 13120 Month
» 321101 Year
» 1205482 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D853 30/08/1961

Names Carried
Name Date From
THRUSTER 30/08/1961

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 43
Wheels B-B
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L100
Works Number 27982
Cost when Built £
To Service 30/08/1961
Withdrawn 03/10/1971
Time in Service 10 yrs, 1 mth , 3 dys
Total Mileage 701,000 miles
Cut Up 16/06/1972
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
83D Laira (New) 30/08/1961
83A Newton Abbot 7w/e 22/06/1964
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 31/10/1967
81A Old Oak Common q/e 22/08/1970
83A Newton Abbot q/e 14/11/1970
   Withdrawn 03/10/1971


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
30/08/1961 To Service To service as D853, name: THRUSTER
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27982
Allocated to Laira (83D)
   
12/11/1961 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - Outside weigh house. SLS 1/1962 Link
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
29/11/1964 Sightings Swindon Works visit: In 'A' shop RO 1/1965 Link
31/10/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
29/06/1969 Sightings Old Oak Common depot: On shed RO 9/1969 Link
22/08/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
14/11/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
03/10/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as D853    
09/01/1972 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Derelict shell RO 3/1972 Link
21/01/1972 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Around the works RO 3/1972 Link
16/06/1972 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev